HI HB1055 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1055

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides the director of transportation with authority to acquire real property on behalf of the State for roads and streets without review or approval by the board of land and natural resources and specifies that, upon acquisition, jurisdiction over the real property is immediately transferred to the department of transportation. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Highways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-19HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 576) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-02-16HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Tokioka.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-10HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1).
2021-02-10HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 114) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-05HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1209 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB1055 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback