HI HB1053 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Act 024, 03/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1125).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Act 024, 03/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1125).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the mandatory inscription for civil identification cards to conform with the inscription currently in use. (HB1053 HD1)
Title
Relating To State Identification Cards.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Act 024, 03/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1125). |
2019-04-26 | House | Act 024, on 04/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1125). |
2019-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 690). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1901) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-19 10:10AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1323) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 10:45AM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 442). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 946) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Say, Yamane, Thielen. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-19. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-04-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1279 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.