HI HB1041 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Act 015, 04/27/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Act 015, 04/27/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes "every fifth year reporting" requirement by the greenhouse gas emissions reduction task force to the Legislature and changes who is authorized to appoint the panel to conduct the evaluation of the energy systems development special fund projects.
Title
Relating To Reporting By The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Act 015, 04/27/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115). |
2017-04-27 | House | Act 015, on 04/27/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115). |
2017-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 543). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1491) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to ETT. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 168). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 824), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-09-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB907 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1041&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1041_.HTM |