HI HB1041 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-11 at 5:00pm in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-11 at 5:00pm in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates medicare part B reimbursements for employee-beneficiaries or spouses of employee-beneficiaries who are hired after 6/30/11. Clarifies the amount to be paid to the EUTF by public employers for the medicare part B premiums of certain beneficiaries. Effective 7/1/50. (SD2)
Title
Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund; Medicare Part B Reimbursements
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-11 at 5:00pm in Conference Room 325. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-11 10:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Shimabukuro. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Rhoads, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Fontaine. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 537) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1246) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-07 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ryan ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-07-11 9:35AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-11 9:15AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 983) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-22-11 10:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-11 8:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 230). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hanohano, Pine voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Chong excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 913) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) The votes in FIN were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 02/26/11. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) Bill scheduled for reconsideration of previous decision by FIN on 03-02-11 3:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2011-02-26 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Tokioka. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-11 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 472) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Saiki, Fontaine, Johanson; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Souki; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Luke. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-11-11 9:10AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1268 (Same As) 2011-02-16 - (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure.