HI HB1032 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1378).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a state boating facility lease pilot program to allow the Board of Land and Natural Resources to lease Manele Small Boat Harbor in its entirety, and fast lands and submerged lands within it. (HB1032 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To State Boating Facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateVetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1378).
2019-07-09HouseVetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1378).
2019-06-24SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-19 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
2019-06-24HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 75).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 75) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-24SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-24HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
2019-04-23HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 10:30AM in conference room 312.
2019-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 10:30AM in conference room 312.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-18SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 814).
2019-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Lowen, Todd Co-Chairs; Tarnas, Thielen.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 818) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2026) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee on WAM will reconsider its previous decision on 03-28-19 and will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:25AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1493) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 438).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1225) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from WLH/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 599) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH/EEP on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:30AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to WLH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1258 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback