HI HB1019 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Act 046, 06/08/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Act 046, 06/08/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the ocean stewardship special fund and ocean stewardship user fee for the collection and use of moneys for the conservation, restoration, and enhancement of the State's marine resources. Sunsets the special fund on 1/1/2029. Delays collection of the ocean stewardship user fee until 1/1/2024. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Ocean Stewardship.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Act 046, 06/08/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146). |
2021-06-10 | House | Act 046, on 06/08/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146). |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 111). |
2021-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 111) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Kanuha, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 4:00PM in conference room CR 016. |
2021-04-20 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-21-21 4:00PM in conference room CR 016. |
2021-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 842). |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-20-21 3:00PM in conference room CR 016. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Misalucha. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Branco Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 738) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1660) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Taniguchi. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1233) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 271). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 862) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 540) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-16-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-16-21. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-11-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1173 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).