HI HB101 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB101

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that persons that enter private property for recreational purposes have no cause of action, unless exempted under law. Requires a court to award attorneys' fees and costs to landowners if plaintiffs bring unreasonable claims. States that, as a matter of law, persons participating in outdoor recreational activities accept the inherent dangers in the activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Tort Liability.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-02HouseThe committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB568 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB101 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback