HI HB1006 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Department of Human Services to create a family justice center task force to consider the establishment of family justice centers to assist victims of domestic violence, sexual assault, elder abuse, or human trafficking, and provide family-based social services. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB1006 HD1)
Title
Family Justice Center Task Force
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 446) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-12 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Cabanilla, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-12-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |