HI HB1004 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Act 032, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1132).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides appropriations for collective bargaining cost items for the members of bargaining unit (5) and their excluded counterparts, including the cost of salary adjustments negotiated between the State and the bargaining unit representative for fiscal biennium 2023-2025. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Employment Cost Items.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01SenateAct 032, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1132).
2023-06-01HouseAct 032, on 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1132).
2023-05-04HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2023-05-04HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996).
2023-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901).
2023-05-04HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2).
2023-05-04SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
2023-05-02SenateDeferred One Day 05-04-23.
2023-05-02HouseDeferred one day 05-04-23.
2023-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
2023-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 82).
2023-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
2023-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 82) as amended in (CD 1).
2023-04-28SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-04-28HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kila, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-04-28HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 1:45PM in conference room 016.
2023-04-27HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 11:15AM in conference room 016.
2023-04-25HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-27-23 11:00AM in conference room 016.
2023-04-24SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
2023-04-24HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 971).
2023-04-21SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 830).
2023-04-20HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Garrett Co-Chairs; Kila, Alcos.
2023-04-14SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
2023-04-13HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2023-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 815) in amended form (SD 1).
2023-04-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
2023-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
2023-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1710) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2023-03-30SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
2023-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2023-03-20SenateReported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1185) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2023-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
2023-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
2023-03-09SenateReferred to LBT, WAM.
2023-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 99).
2023-03-02HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2023-03-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 914), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2023-02-22HouseThe committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2023-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
2023-02-14HouseReported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 369) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2023-02-09HouseThe committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 02-09-23 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-01-30HouseReferred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3
2023-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2023-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1302 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Perruso excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback