HI HB1000 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1000
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires criminal history checks of adult relatives who provide care for a child whose family receives a child care subsidy from the DHS. Clarifies information sharing duties and limitations. Increases penalties. Allows DHS to take both administrative and judicial action to enforce child care licensing provisions. (HB1000 HD2)
Title
Relating To Child Care.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 494) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Morikawa. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 185) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Mizuno, Say. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 02-06-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1000 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
SB1226 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 083, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184).
SB1226 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 083, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184).