HI HB10 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the board of education to invite the exclusive representative for bargaining unit (5) (teachers and other personnel of the department of education) to appoint a nonvoting public school teacher representative to the board and the exclusive representative for bargaining unit (6) (educational officers) to appoint a nonvoting public school administrator representative to the board. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Board Of Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
2021-02-11HouseReported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 155) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-04HouseThe committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
2021-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to EDN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-20HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback