GA SR899 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION recognizing March 9, 2018, as Unify Georgia Day at the state capitol; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unify Georgia Day; recognize March 9, 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-07SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-21SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback