GA SR865 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION supporting the creation of the State of Georgia Council on Respiratory Health Promotion; and for other purposes.
Title
State of Georgia Council on Respiratory Health Promotion; support creation
Sponsors
Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] |
Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53093 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/174244 |