GA SR84 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the Congress of the United States to enact significant reforms to the nation's federally financed graduate medical education programs and to provide states with additional resources to meet the health workforce needs of the future; and for other purposes.
Title
U.S. Congress; urged to enact significant reforms to the nation's federally financed graduate medical education programs
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #264 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43013 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/145973 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43013#12741 |