GA SR799 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION commending the Nation of Israel for its meaningful and mutually beneficial relationship with the United States and with the State of Georgia; and for other purposes.
Title
Nation of Israel; commend
Sponsors
Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] |
Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] | Sen. Sally Harrell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |