GA SR774 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee on Adoption Expenses; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Study Committee on Adoption Expenses; create

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #515 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-26SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-13SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback