GA SR772 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee on Retrospective Emergency Room Policies; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Study Committee on Retrospective Emergency Room Policies; create
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hopper |