GA SR761 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Study Committee on Dyslexia; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Study Committee on Dyslexia; create

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-12SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback