GA SR745 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION recognizing Robert H. "Bob" Bell and dedicating interchanges in his honor; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Robert H. "Bob" Bell Interchanges; DeKalb County; dedicate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #801 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #776 (Y: 170 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #516 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Act 544
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-06SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-26SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-12SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-09SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback