GA SR744 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-25 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-25 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION celebrating the anniversary of the signing of the Lahore Resolution on March 23, 1940, and recognizing March 23, 2022, as Pakistan Day at the state capitol; and for other purposes.
Title
Pakistan Day; recognize March 23, 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Sheikh Rahman [D] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Sen. Nikki Merritt [D] | Sen. Lester Jackson [D] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/62914 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/209716 |