GA SR732 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION commending the Nation of Israel for its cordial and mutually beneficial relationship with the United States and the State of Georgia; and for other purposes.
Title
Nation of Israel; commend
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52654 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/172839 |