GA SR693 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION dedicating the Ways & Means conference room under the jurisdiction of the House of Representatives to Representative Alfred Jackson "Jay" Powell Jr.; and for other purposes.
Title
Ways & Means Conference Room; Representative Alfred Jackson "Jay" Powell Jr.; dedicate
Sponsors
Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57143 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/189218 |