GA SR623 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Special Committee on Election Integrity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Special Committee on Election Integrity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution of Georgia so as to provide for staggered, four-year terms of office for members of the Senate; to provide for the implementation of staggered terms of office for members of the Senate; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Election and Term of Members; implementation of staggered terms of office for members of the Senate; provide -CA
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Adoption Of Constitutional Amendment By Substitute: Senate Vote #664 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Hopper |