GA SR565 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION designating the Northwest Georgia Logistics Corridor as an official logistics growth corridor in Georgia; and for other purposes.
Title
Northwest Georgia Logistics Corridor; official logistics growth corridor in Georgia; designate
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Rep. Joseph Gullett [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Adoption By Substitute: Senate Vote #607 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |