GA SR539 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION recognizing Jon Richards; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Richards, Jon; recognize

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #746 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2018-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-29SenateSenate Taken from Table
2018-03-27SenateSenate Tabled
2018-02-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-24SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback