GA SR537 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 542
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION providing for the closure of certain state property to unauthorized vehicular traffic; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Property; unauthorized vehicular traffic; provide closure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-23 - House - House Vote #759 (Y: 106 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #567 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Act 542
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-03-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-19HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-24SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback