GA SR455 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Study Committee on Adult Changing Stations in Commercial Public Facilities; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate Study Committee on Adult Changing Stations in Commercial Public Facilities; create
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56249 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/185821 |