GA SR412 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Stroke Trauma Center Study Committee; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Stroke Trauma Center Study Committee; create

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #246 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-13SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback