GA SR388 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution, in a manner consistent with the United States Constitution, so as to prevent discrimination in the public funding of social services by allowing religious or faith based organizations to receive public aid, directly or indirectly, for the provision of such services; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitution; prevent discrimination in the public funding of social services; allow religious/faith based organization to receive public aid -CA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #549 (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07HouseHouse Second Readers
2016-03-02HouseHouse First Readers
2016-02-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2016-02-29SenateSenate Third Read
2016-02-29SenateSenate Taken from Table
2016-02-26SenateSenate Tabled
2016-02-10SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2016-01-11SenateSenate Recommitted
2015-03-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2015-03-04SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2015-03-02SenateSenate Read and Referred
2015-02-26SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback