GA SR351 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION commending Grady Memorial Hospital and Grady Health System on the occasion of its 125th anniversary; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grady Memorial Hospital; commend

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-01SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-01SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback