GA SR349 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION urging Congress to block grant Medicaid funding to be used for indigent health care and Medicaid funding; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congress; block grant Medicaid funding to be used for indigent health care and Medicaid funding; urge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-01SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback