GA SR347 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Senate Read and Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION recognizing the choral group, Men of Summer Hill; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Men of Summer Hill; recognize

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28SenateSenate Read and Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-01SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback