GA SR344 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION commending the benefits and contributions of purebred dogs and recognizing May 1, 2023, as Purebred Dog Day in the State of Georgia; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Purebred Dog Day; recognize May 1, 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-24 - Senate - Adoption By Substitute: Senate Vote #419 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-24SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2024-01-24SenateSenate Third Read
2024-01-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2024-01-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-03-16SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-03-15SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback