GA SR343 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Senate Read and Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Senate Read and Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing and commending Sally Bell; and for other purposes.
Title
Bell, Sally; recognize
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/51144 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/167220 |