GA SR328 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Parking and Vehicle Immobilization Study Committee; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate Parking and Vehicle Immobilization Study Committee; create
Sponsors
Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |