GA SR319 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing the current Electoral College system as the best way to elect the President of the United States; and for other purposes.
Title
Electoral College; recognize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Adoption: Senate Vote #591 (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |