GA SR288 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Consolidation of State Fire Safety Services Study Committee; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate Consolidation of State Fire Safety Services Study Committee; create
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Hopper |