GA SR264 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Emergency Medical Services Study Committee; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Emergency Medical Services Study Committee; create
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] | Rep. Tom Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #149 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |