GA SR263 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-04 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-04 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing the benefits of public health programs in Georgia's local communities; urging the President and Congress of the United States to provide support to strengthen Georgia's public health infrastructure; and for other purposes.
Title
President/U.S. Congress; urged to provide support to strengthen Georgia's public health infrastructure
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Preston Smith [R] | Sen. Cecil Staton [R] |
Sen. Donald Thomas [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #119 - Adoption (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-04 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-02-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-12 | Senate Read and Referred |