GA SR237 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION requesting that the United States Congress call a convention under Article V of the Constitution of the United States limited to proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to set a limit on the number of terms that a person may be elected as a member of the United States House of Representatives and to set a limit on the number of terms that a person may be elected as a member of the United States Senate; and for other purposes.
Title
United States Congress; call a convention; limit on the number of terms that a person may be elected; United States House of Representatives; request
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #155 (Y: 31 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |