GA SR227 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recommending the Georgia congressional delegation to intercede with the United States Department of Transportation, and to initiate or support whatever federal legislative action may be necessary, to prevent loss of aviation fuel tax revenue use in Clayton County; and for other purposes.
Title
US Department of Transportation; initiate or support whatever federal legislative action, prevent loss of aviation fuel tax revenue use in Clayton County; recommend Georgia congressional delegation to intercede
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #247 (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |