GA SR205 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION urging the Congress of the United States to eliminate all requirements for the use of ethanol as a fuel for vehicles and equipment; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

US Congress; eliminate all requirements for use of ethanol as a fuel for vehicles and equipment; urge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-02-17SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-16SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-10SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback