GA SR192 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - House Committee Unfavorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - House Committee Unfavorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize the General Assembly to provide by law for election of local school superintendents by voters and election of members of local boards of education by grand juries, as an alternative to appointment of local school superintendents by local boards of education and election of local school board members by voters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
General Assembly; election of local school superintendents; local boards of education by grand juries as alternative to appointment; authorize -CA
Sponsors
Sen. John Wilkinson [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #155 (Y: 40 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Unfavorably Reported |
2017-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |