GA SR163 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION authorizing the Senate Rules Committee, during the 2015-2016 biennium of the General Assembly, to place witnesses under oath or affirmation when testifying before said committee in regard to legislation which is then in the possession of the committee or eligible for placement on the rules calendar of the Senate; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate Rules Committee; authorize to place witnesses under oath or affirmations; testifying; eligible for placement on the rules calendar
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Valencia Seay [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hopper |