GA SR146 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 467
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to provide for certain rights for victims who have suffered or been harmed due to an act committed or attempted to be committed in violation of the criminal or juvenile delinquency laws of this state; to provide for the enforcement of such rights; to provide for related matters; to provide for submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certain Rights for Victims; suffered or harmed due to an act committed; in violation of the criminal or juvenile delinquency laws; provide-CA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #766 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #769 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #151 (Y: 20 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #152 (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Act 467
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-06HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-03SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-27SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-02SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-01SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/SR/146
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/164232.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/166765.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167433.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167438.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167457.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167652.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/177318.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178915.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15103
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15102
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16164
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16360

Bill Comments

feedback