GA SR1091 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Study Committee on Hearing Aids for Children; and for other purposes.
Title
Hearing Aids for Children; create Senate Study Committee
Sponsors
Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] |
Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/48846 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/159120 |