GA SR105 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution, in a manner consistent with the United States Constitution, so as to prevent discrimination in the public funding of social services by allowing religious or faith based organizations to receive public aid, directly or indirectly, for the provision of such services; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States Constitution; religious organizations receive public aid; prevent discrimination - CA

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-03-01SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-31SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-30SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback