GA SR104 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to prohibit the levy of state ad valorem taxes; to provide for applicability; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Ad Valorem Taxes; prohibit levy -CA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #110 (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #109 (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-26SenateSenate Tabled
2018-02-26SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-03-01SenateSenate Reconsidered
2017-02-28SenateSenate Notice to Reconsider
2017-02-28SenateSenate Lost
2017-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-28SenateSenate Engrossed
2017-02-24SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-01-31SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-30SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback