GA SR100 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to provide for state-wide grand juries; to provide for the jurisdiction, powers, and duties of state-wide grand juries; to authorize the General Assembly to provide by law for procedures for the summoning and empaneling of state-wide grand juries; to provide for a presiding judge; to provide that the Attorney General or his or her designee shall act as the legal adviser and prosecutor for such state-wide grand juries; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
State-Wide Grand Juries; jurisdiction, powers, and duties; provide -CA
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Sb 213, Sb 241, Sr 100, Sb 62, Sb 69, Sb 71, Sb 72: Senate Vote #155 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59629 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/197616 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59629#18461 |