GA SB99 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 35-3-34 of the O.C.G.A., relating to disclosure and dissemination of criminal records to private persons and businesses, resulting responsibility and liability of the Georgia Crime Information Center, and provision of certain information to the FBI in conjunction with the National Instant Criminal Background Check System, so as to provide for a judicial procedure for purging a person's involuntary hospitalization information received by the center for the purpose of the National Instant Criminal Background Check System under certain circumstances; to change provisions relating to the retention of a person's involuntary hospitalization information; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Crime Information Center; purging a person's hospitalization information for purpose of National Instant Criminal Background Check; provide for a judicial procedure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #142 (Y: 41 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #143 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-06HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-03SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-01SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-31SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback